Global Patent Index - EP 1075877 A2

EP 1075877 A2 2001-02-14 - A method of manufacturing a metal and polymeric composite article

Title (en)

A method of manufacturing a metal and polymeric composite article

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polymer-Metallverbundkörpern

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer des articles en composites metal-polymère

Publication

EP 1075877 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306479 A

Priority

US 37029899 A

Abstract (en)

A method of manufacturing a metal and polymeric composite article by the following steps. Droplets of spray deposited metal (22) and spray deposited polymeric material (32) are combined to form an article (34) having the polymeric material interspersed within the metal. A carrier (16) or form that shaped to receive the metal and polymeric layers is provided. The carrier may be made either stationary or movable. Layers of spray deposited metal and spray deposited polymeric material are applied atop the carrier. The spray deposited metal is between 90 and 95 percent by volume of the article. The polymeric layers do not completely cover the metal layers. Succeeding spray deposited metal layers contact bond to previous metal layers. The polymeric material between imbedded between the interconnected metal layers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/08; B05D 7/00; F16K 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/02 (2006.01); B05D 1/08 (2006.01); C23C 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/08 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/023 (2013.01); B05D 1/08 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 24/04 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01); C23C 28/42 (2013.01); B05D 2350/65 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49272 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49306 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49409 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49989 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075877 A2 20010214; EP 1075877 A3 20030604; CA 2315315 A1 20010209; JP 2001104865 A 20010417; US 6270849 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031129

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/08 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 7/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16K 1/42 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/10 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/34 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 3/02 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/04 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI