Global Patent Index - EP 1075882 A2

EP 1075882 A2 2001-02-14 - Locking device for hydraulically operated presses

Title (en)

Locking device for hydraulically operated presses

Title (de)

Zuhaltevorrichtung für hydraulisch angetriebene Pressen

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour des presses à entraînement hydraulique

Publication

EP 1075882 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116350 A

Priority

DE 19937310 A

Abstract (en)

The locking device is for a simple or double-acting press for high pressure shaping, with a ram (4) moving upwards and downwards and lockable by a cross-bar (11) in the shaping position. The dimension of the height of the cross-bar depends upon the closure stroke of the press (1) and is approximately or completely equal to it. The cross-bar in the locked position is arranged as a vertical extension of the upper rail walls. The height of the cross-bar is at least three times greater than its thickness. The length of the cross-bar corresponds approximately to the length of the ram and consists of a single piece or several segments.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Verriegelungsvorrichtung für hydraulisch angetriebene, einfach- oder doppeltwirkende Pressen (1) zur Hochdruckumformung vorgeschlagen die wesentlich zur Erhöhung der Bauteilsteifigkeit insbesondere des Kopfstücks oder Oberholm (5) beiträgt. Durch Anordnung der Riegel (11) auf der Oberseite der Umformstössel (4) kann für die Bauhöhe der Riegel (11) der komplette Schliesshub genutzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01); B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/025 (2011.01); B21D 26/039 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/025 (2013.01); B21D 22/205 (2013.01); B21D 26/039 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075882 A2 20010214; EP 1075882 A3 20011114; EP 1075882 B1 20030924; DE 10036779 A1 20010315; ES 2208194 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208194 T3

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003807 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI