Global patent index - EP 1075897 A1

EP 1075897 A1 2001-02-14 - Lapping machine with two plates

Title (en)

Lapping machine with two plates

Title (de)

Zweischeiben-Feinschleifmaschine

Title (fr)

Rodeuse avec deux plats de rodage

Publication

EP 1075897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113746 A

Priority

DE 19937784 A

Abstract (en)

The twin-disc precision grinder has a housing (10) and a top and bottom operating disc (20.44) each of which is fixed to a support disc (18,42). A top and bottom vertical drive shaft drive the operating discs which are pivot mounted in the housing by means of roller bearings and are driven by a motor via gears.. A cooler cools the operating discs by means of cooling fluid. The surface of the support disc facing the operating disc has at least one radially sealed chamber (34,62) connected to the operating surface by means of axially parallel holes (36,64) in the operating discs. Each shaft (22,46) has at least one axially parallel duct supplied with cooling lubricating fluid by means of a stationary inlet (26,50).

Abstract (de)

Zweischeiben-Feinschleifmaschine mit einem Maschinengehäuse, einer oberen und einer unteren Arbeitsscheibe (20,44), die jeweils an einer Trägerscheibe (18,42) befestigt sind, einer oberen und einer unteren vertikalen Antriebswelle zum Antrieb der Arbeitsscheiben, die mittels Rollenlager im Maschinengehäuse drehbar gelagert und von einem Motor über Getriebemittel antreibbar sind, und mit einer Kühlvorrichtung, die mittels Kühlflüssigkeit die Arbeitsscheiben kühlt, wobei in der der jeweiligen Arbeitsscheibe (20,44) zugekehrten Fläche der Trägerscheibe (18,42) mindestens eine radial abgedichtete Kammer (34,62) geformt ist, die über achsparallele Bohrungen (36,64) der Arbeitsscheiben (20,44) mit deren Arbeitsfläche verbunden ist, und jede Welle (22,46) mindestens einen achsparallelen Kanal (86,88,120,122) aufweist, dem von einer Quelle für Kühlschmierflüssigkeit über eine stationäre Zuführvorrichtung (26,50) Kühlschmierflüssigkeit zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04; B24B 55/02; B24B 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/08 (2012.01); B24B 37/11 (2012.01); B24B 55/02 (2006.01); B24B 57/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/08 (2013.01); B24B 37/11 (2013.01); B24B 55/02 (2013.01); B24B 57/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075897 A1 20010214; EP 1075897 B1 20060913; DE 19937784 A1 20010222; DE 19937784 B4 20060216; DE 50013453 D1 20061026

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LAPMASTER WOLTERS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50013453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50013453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040330

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI