Global Patent Index - EP 1075931 A2

EP 1075931 A2 2001-02-14 - Eccentric press

Title (en)

Eccentric press

Title (de)

Exzenterpresse

Title (fr)

Presse excentrique

Publication

EP 1075931 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115332 A

Priority

DE 19938450 A

Abstract (en)

The eccentric press has at least one eccentric shaft (3) with drive (49) connected to the shaft by means of a transmission gear (43) in the form of a differential gear. The drive's output is distributed onto two parallel transmission stages (44,45). The eccentric shaft has a spur wheel (12). The transmission gear has two parallel intermediate shafts (25,25') each of which has a power-take-off (27,27') between the two stages and connected to the eccentric shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Exzenterpresse (1) mit einer Exzenterwelle (3) und einem Antrieb (49), der über ein Vorgelegegetriebe mit der Exzenterwelle betriebsverbunden ist. Um derartige Exzenterpressen kompakter zu gestalten, weist das Vorgelegegetriebe ein Ausgleichsgetriebe (30) auf, mit dem die Leistung des Antriebs auf zwei parallel geschaltete Übersetzungsstufen (44,45) des Vorgelegegetriebes aufteilbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075931 A2 20010214; EP 1075931 A3 20021113; EP 1075931 B1 20090826; DE 19938450 A1 20010301; DE 19938450 C2 20011108; DE 50015729 D1 20091008; ES 2329966 T3 20091203

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100527

2009-12-03 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2329966

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-10-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2009-07-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HENNIG, JUERGEN

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ TECHNOLOGY AND ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI