Global Patent Index - EP 1075931 A3

EP 1075931 A3 2002-11-13 - Eccentric press

Title (en)

Eccentric press

Title (de)

Exzenterpresse

Title (fr)

Presse excentrique

Publication

EP 1075931 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115332 A

Priority

DE 19938450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1075931A2] The eccentric press has at least one eccentric shaft (3) with drive (49) connected to the shaft by means of a transmission gear (43) in the form of a differential gear. The drive's output is distributed onto two parallel transmission stages (44,45). The eccentric shaft has a spur wheel (12). The transmission gear has two parallel intermediate shafts (25,25') each of which has a power-take-off (27,27') between the two stages and connected to the eccentric shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075931 A2 20010214; EP 1075931 A3 20021113; EP 1075931 B1 20090826; DE 19938450 A1 20010301; DE 19938450 C2 20011108; DE 50015729 D1 20091008; ES 2329966 T3 20091203

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160714

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015729

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100527

2009-12-03 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2329966 T3

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015729 P 20091008

2009-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2009-07-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HENNIG, JUERGEN

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ TECHNOLOGY AND ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI