Global Patent Index - EP 1075944 A1

EP 1075944 A1 2001-02-14 - Printing machine

Title (en)

Printing machine

Title (de)

Druckwerk

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1075944 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116752 A

Priority

DE 19937805 A

Abstract (en)

The printing unit has several cylinders (6-9) each with its own drive motor. The cylinders are adjustable in relation to each other by means of a carriage-guide. The machine framework has a support wall positioned to one side near one end side (11) of the printing cylinders. The support wall (1) has two walls (15) at right angles to a plane on the end surfaces of the cylinders. The two facing walls have guide elements for carriages (2-5) adjustably positioned between the walls. Each carriage has a firmly inserted threaded nut into which fits a driven threaded spindle (18-21).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Druckwerk für eine Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine mit mehreren, je einen eigenen Antriebsmotor aufweisenden Druckwerkszylindern, die mittels einer Schlittenführung zueinander einstellbar sind, lassen sich dadurch die Übertragung von durch einen Druckwerkszylinder angeregten Schwingungen auf andere Druckwerkszylinder über die Mittel zur Einstellung der Schlitten vermeiden und gleichzeitig lange Schlittenführungen für breite Schlitten erreichen, dass das Maschinengestell mindestens eine seitlich neben einer Stirnseite (z.B.11) der Druckwerkszylinder (z.B.9) angeordnete Tragwand (1,52) aufweist, die zwei senkrecht zu einer an die Stirnflächen der Druckwerkszylinder gelegten Ebene verlaufende Wandungen (11,15,46,51) besitzt, dass die beiden einander zugewandten Wandungen mit Führungselementen (12,13,16,17,53 bis 56) für zwischen den Wandungen einstellbar angeordnete Schlitten (2 bis 5,42,43,47,48) versehen sind und jeder Schlitten eine fest eingesetzte Gewindemutter aufnimmt, in die eine angetriebene Gewindespindel (18 bis 21) eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/26 (2006.01); B41F 13/30 (2006.01); B41F 13/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075944 A1 20010214; EP 1075944 B1 20060222; CA 2316099 A1 20010210; CA 2316099 C 20041207; DE 19937805 A1 20010215; DE 50012247 D1 20060427; JP 2001062990 A 20010313; JP 3378230 B2 20030217; US 6494135 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012247

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012247

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50012247

- Effective date: 20120626

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090803

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012247 P 20060427

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010728

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI