Global Patent Index - EP 1075945 A1

EP 1075945 A1 2001-02-14 - Printing machine

Title (en)

Printing machine

Title (de)

Druckwerk

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1075945 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116839 A

Priority

  • DE 19937795 A
  • DE 10008225 A

Abstract (en)

The printing unit has cylinders (6-9) each with a drive motor. Guide elements for the cylinders are positioned on at least one support wall (1) located to one side near the adjacent end sides of the printing unit cylinders. The cylinders are mounted in carriages (2-5) driven by a drive mechanism The guide elements face each other parallel with the support wall.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Druckwerk für eine Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine mit mehreren je einen Antriebsmotor aufweisenden Druckwerkszylindern (6-9; 38-41; 44,45,49,50) und mit an mindestens einer seitlich neben den benachbarten Stirnseiten der Druckwerkszylinder (6-9; 38-41; 44,45,49,50) angeordneten Tragwand (1,52) angebrachten Führungselementen (12,13,16,17,53-56) für den Druckwerkszylindem (6-9; 38-41; 44,45,49,50) zugeordnete, mittels einer Antriebseinrichtung verfahrbare Schlitten (2-5); 42,43,47,48), lassen sich dadurch trotz eines kompakten Aufbaus lange Schlittenführungen für breite Schlitten erreichen, dass die Führungselemente (12,13,16,17,53-56) einander gegenüberliegend zueinander parallel an der Tragwand (1,52) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/30; B41F 13/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 13/30 (2006.01); B41F 13/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/30 (2013.01); B41F 13/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075945 A1 20010214; EP 1075945 B1 20070606; DE 50014384 D1 20070719; JP 2001062988 A 20010313; JP 3411261 B2 20030526; US 6397743 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50014384

- Effective date: 20120626

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090804

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090804

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070906

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014384 P 20070719

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI