Global patent index - EP 1075994 A1

EP 1075994 A1 2001-02-14 - Drive unit for rail vehicle

Title (en)

Drive unit for rail vehicle

Title (de)

Antriebseinheit für ein Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Unité d'entraînement pour un véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1075994 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00111732 A

Priority

GB 9918755 A

Abstract (en)

A drive unit (22) for propelling a rail vehicle (10) along a track includes a pair of drive wheels (24) for engaging the track. The drive wheels (24) are mounted on arms (26) which may be pivoted between a position in which the wheels (24) are in driving engagement with the track and a position in which the wheels are out of driving engagement with the track. The drive unit (22) may thus be used to selectively drive the vehicle in a self propelled manner. The drive unit (22) may be folded out of the way when the vehicle is to be propelled by a separate unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 15/00; B61D 3/00; B61J 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/00 (2006.01); B61D 15/00 (2006.01); B61J 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/005 (2013.01); B61D 15/00 (2013.01); B61J 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075994 A1 20010214; GB 9918755 D0 19991013

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040914

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BICC HOLDINGS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI