Global Patent Index - EP 1075996 A1

EP 1075996 A1 2001-02-14 - Vehicles locating method on railway tracks and railway vehicle therefor

Title (en)

Vehicles locating method on railway tracks and railway vehicle therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ortung der Fahrzeuge in einer Gleisanlage und Eisenbahnfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé de localisation de véhicules dans un réseau de voies ferroviaires et véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1075996 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114615 A

Priority

  • DE 19932160 A
  • DE 10003159 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves the use of a computer in which the track network is stored topologically and a path length measurement sensor and a turn angle measurement unit mounted on the vehicle. One-dimensional position determination is performed from a known starting point by path length measurement along the track path stored in the computer. Tracks (Gleis 1 - Gleis 4) are selected at points (1) using the turn angle measurement unit. An Independent claim is also included for a railway vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Mit Hilfe eines Rechners (5 oder 30), in dem das Gleisnetz gespeichert ist, sowie eines Weglängenmeßsensors (8) sowie einer Drehwinkelmeßeinheit (9), die an dem Fahrzeug angebracht sind wird von einem bekannten bzw. gemessenen Ausgangspunkt aus, eine eindimensionale Weglängenmessung längs des in dem Rechner topologisch geordneten und gespeicherten Gleisweges durchgeführt. In Weichen wird mittels einer Drehwinkelmeßeinheit festgestellt, welcher der gespeicherten in die Weiche mündenden Gleisstränge (G1... Gx) befahren wird, indem die Gleisrichtung vor Einfahrt in die Weiche (1) als Ausgangsrichtung vorgegeben und durch die Drehwinkelmeßeinheit die Qualität der von dem Fahrzeug beim Durchfahren der Weiche erlittenen Richtungsänderung erfaßt und mit den Qualitäten der Richtungsänderungen der bekannten Gleisstränge der Weiche verglichen wird. Durch die Drehwinkelmeßeinheit (9) wird in Verbindung mit dem Positionsrechner (5 oder 30) zur Vermeidung von Fehlmeldungen auch das Überschreiten bestimmter vorgegebener Schwellwerte der Richtungsänderung als Entscheidungskriterium für das Befahren eines bestimmten Gleisstrangs (G3) gewertet, insbesondere, wenn die Weiche in einem Gleisbogen liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 25/02; B61L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/00 (2006.01); B61L 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/004 (2013.01); B61L 25/023 (2013.01); B61L 25/025 (2013.01); B61L 25/026 (2013.01); B61L 2205/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1075996 A1 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040323

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEISTER, HANS PROF.DR.ING.

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REINHARDT, WOLFGANG PROF.DR.

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI