Global patent index - EP 1076008 A1

EP 1076008 A1 2001-02-14 - Method and apparatus for emptying bulk bags

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for emptying bulk bags

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON BULK-BAGS

Title (fr)

Procede et appareil pour vider des sacs de grande capacite

Publication

EP 1076008 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114503 A

Priority

DE 19937700 A

Abstract (en)

The emptying station for bulk-bags containing particulate material comprises a box with a funnel-shaped outlet (2, 3) at the bottom. The bag (10) is held on a lift device (16) and opened by three cutter blades (4a) forming a pyramid with a spike (4b) at its point. The novelty is that the lift carries a lock (14) for the box and a seal (7) closes the space between the bag and box below the holders (15) for the bag. An Independent claim is included for a method of emptying a bulk-bag using the station.

Abstract (de)

Die Entleerstation für Bulk-Bags, insbesondere für teilchenförmige Gefahrgüter, umfasst eine Aufnahmevorrichtung (2) mit einem Auslaß (3) und eine Öffnungsvorrichtung (4) auf der Basis von Pyramidenmessern (4a). Erfindungsgemäß werden die Aufnahme- und Öffnungsvorrichtung von einem Kasten (1) mit Wänden (1a), welche eine Vorrichtung zum Abdichten (7) aufweisen, umfasst. Mittels einer Verschlußvorrichtung (14) an einer Tragevorrichtung (16) für den Bulk-Bag wird der Kasten beim Entleeren verschlossen. Vorzugsweise sind im Kasten Sprühdüsen zum äußerlichen und/oder innerlichen Spülen des entleerten Bulk-Bags angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 69/00; B65D 90/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19641982 C1 19980520 - DEGUSSA [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076008 A1 20010214; AR 024751 A1 20021023; BR 0003480 A 20010403; CN 1127429 C 20031112; CN 1283577 A 20010214; DE 19937700 A1 20010215; ID 26847 A 20010215; IL 137770 A 20040219; IL 137770 D0 20011031; JP 2001072027 A 20010321; KR 20010077842 A 20010820; TR 200001805 A2 20010321; TR 200001805 A3 20010321; US 6293318 B1 20010925; ZA 200004051 B 20010425

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031125

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI