Global patent index - EP 1076012 A1

EP 1076012 A1 2001-02-14 - Food package having a venting valve and method for preparing such food

Title (en)

Food package having a venting valve and method for preparing such food

Title (de)

Lebensmittelverpackung mit Ventil und Zubereitungsverfahren für Lebensmittel

Title (fr)

Emballage pour produits alimentaires, ayant une soupape de surpression et méthode pour la préparation de ces produits

Publication

EP 1076012 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810671 A

Priority

CH 145799 A

Abstract (en)

A one-trip deep-drawn plastics container (1) is used for the transport and subsequent microwave preparation of food (8). The container has a sealed closure (4) which incorporates a one-way valve (5) which releases steam above a given pressure differential of 5 Mb and which remains open during the subsequent cooling phase.

Abstract (de)

Die beschriebene Transport- und/oder Verkaufsverpackung (1,4) für und mit Lebensmittel/n (8), die zum Verzehr in erwärmtem Zustand bestimmt sind und in der Verpackung (1,4) erhitzt werden sollen, besteht aus einem mikrowellentauglichen Material, wobei die Lebensmittel (8) in der Verpackung (1,4) vorzugsweise wenigstens teilweise in rohem Zustand enthalten sind, wobei unter Einrechnung des Wassergehalts der Lebensmittel (8) soviel Flüssigkeit in der Verpackung enthalten ist, dass die Lebensmittel (8) in der Verpackung in einem Mikrowellenofen in einer sich dabei ausbildenden Dampfatmosphäre gegart werden können und wobei die Verpackung ein sich bei einem inneren Überdruck nach aussen selbsttätig öffnendes, nach einem Abfall dieses Überdrucks selbsttätig wieder schliessendes Einwege-Rückschlagventil (5) in einer Wand (4) umfasst, welches den in ihr beim schnellen Erhitzen in einem Mikrowellenofen entstehenden Dampfdruck begrenzt und/oder reduziert. Das Ventil ist so ausgebildet, dass es während der Erhitzung der Lebensmittel in der Verpackung soweit verändert wird, dass es anschliessend zumindest wärend einer ersten Abkühlphase der Lebensmittel auf eine Verzehrtemperatur nicht mehr schliessen kann. Hierdurch kann sich in der Verpackung während der Abühlung auf die Verzehrtemperatur kein Unterduck ausbilden und die Verpackung keine negative Deformation erleiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/22; B65D 81/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 5/10 (2016.01); B65D 77/22 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/225 (2013.01); B65D 81/3453 (2013.01); B65D 2205/00 (2013.01); Y10S 99/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9932373 A1 19990701 - KELLER KARL [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918753 U1 20000217; AT 276936 T 20041015; BR 0003459 A 20010320; CA 2314951 A1 20010209; CA 2314951 C 20070605; DE 50007857 D1 20041028; DK 1076012 T3 20050131; EP 1076012 A1 20010214; EP 1076012 B1 20040922; ES 2230051 T3 20050501; JP 2001072143 A 20010321; JP 4248737 B2 20090402; NL 1013985 C1 20000128; US 6380524 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140727

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: DR. JOACHIM LAUER C/O RENTSCH PARTNER AG;FRAUMUENSTERSTRASSE 9 POSTFACH 2441;8022 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CREATIVE NEW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-02-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CREATIVE NEW FOOD DREAM STEAM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2007-02-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2230051

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050116

2005-01-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-12-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. JOACHIM LAUER PATENTANWALT

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI