Global Patent Index - EP 1076015 A1

EP 1076015 A1 2001-02-14 - Actuator for dispensing foam

Title (en)

Actuator for dispensing foam

Title (de)

Schaumkopf

Title (fr)

Tête distributrice de mousse

Publication

EP 1076015 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116892 A

Priority

  • DE 19937554 A
  • DE 29913861 U

Abstract (en)

The foam dispensing head for a pressurised container has foam producing tubes (36) positioned within the dispensing head (30). This is situated above an expansion chamber which is connected to the dispensing tube of a. conventional dispensing head. The height of the expansion chamber and the foam producing tubes increases with distance from the dispensing tube.

Abstract (de)

Schaumkopf (20) für Flüssigkeit enthaltende Druckbehälter mit einem Abgabeventil, das einen Ventilschaft aufweist. Ein Auslaßstutzen, durch den sich ein Auslaßkanal erstreckt, ist zur Betätigung des Abgabeventils auf dessen Ventilschaft aufsteckbar. Ein Expansionsraum hat einen Boden, eine Seitenwand (30) und eine Abgabeöffnung (32) oberhalb des Bodens. Der Auslaßkanal ist an seinem oberen Ende (32) mit mindestens einer radialen Durchtrittsöffnung versehen, die den Auslaßkanal mit dem Expansionsraum verbindet. Die einzige Abgabeöffnung (32) ist, in Draufsicht auf den Schaumkopf gesehen, überwiegend im Abstand über dem Boden des Expansionsraumes angeordnet. Eine Vielzahl von Verschäumungselementen (36) erstreckt sich in geringem seitlichen Abstand voneinander vom Boden bis in den Bereich der Abgabeöffnung (32), um Verschäumungskanäle zwischen den Verschäumungselementen in zum Auslaßstutzen etwa radialer und achsparalleler Richtung zu bilden. Der Schaumkopf ist als Massenprodukt universal, insbesondere für schwer verschäumbare Flüssigkeiten, verwendbar und als Massenprodukt wirtschaftlich herstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B05B 7/00; B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/30 (2013.01); B65D 83/205 (2013.01); B65D 83/753 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076015 A1 20010214; EP 1076015 B1 20051221

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH, 44319 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011892

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011892 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI