Global Patent Index - EP 1076028 A2

EP 1076028 A2 2001-02-14 - Yarn connecting device for a textile machine making cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Yarn connecting device for a textile machine making cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Fadenverbindungseinrichtung für eine Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rattachement du fil pour une machine textile fabriquant des bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 1076028 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114595 A

Priority

DE 19938432 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus to splice yarn ends at a cross wound bobbin winder, with a pneumatic action outside the yarn travel path, has a suction catch tube (25). A control wedge block (33) is at the upper end position of the suction tube (25) to give a defined action on the flap tube (18). As the suction catch tube (25) is swung against the control block (33), the initial action is to open the entry (27) into the tube (25). When the tube (25) is swung clear of the control block (33), the effect is to close the entry (27) into the tube. The control block (33) has two separate sliding paths (48). The first path (48) controls the movement of the flap tube (18) as the tube swings upwards. The second path controls the flap (18) as the tube swings downwards. The control block (33) has a base body (30) and a curved section held in a basic position by a spring (35). The sliding paths (48) at the control block (33) match an operating cam (62) at the tube flap (18), with a strap at the curved section. A notch, which is always open, is at the tube opening (27).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fadenverbindungseinrichtung für eine Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine mit einer außerhalb des normalen Fadenlaufes angeordneten Spleißeinrichtung (22) zum pneumatischen Verbinden von Fadenenden sowie einem saugluftbeaufschlagbaren Greiferrohr (25) zum Handhaben der zu verspleißenden Fadenenden. Das Greiferrohr 25 weist dabei eine schwenkbar gelagerte Greiferrohrklappe (18) zum Verschließen der Greiferrohrmündung (27) auf. Erfindungsgemäß ist im Bereich einer oberen Endlage (II) des Greiferrohres (25) eine Steuerkulisse (33) zur definierten Beaufschlagung der Greiferrohrklappe (18) angeordnet. Die Steuerkulisse (33) ist dabei so ausgebildet, daß die Greiferrohrklappe (18) beim Einschwenken des Greiferrohres (25) in die Steuerkulisse (33) etwas von der Greiferrohrmündung (27) abgehoben wird, während die Greiferrohrklappe (18) beim Ausschwenken des Greiferrohres (25) aus der Steuerkulisse (33) die Greiferrohrmündung (27) stets verschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/08 (2006.01); D01H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/081 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076028 A2 20010214; EP 1076028 A3 20011121; EP 1076028 B1 20040218; DE 19938432 A1 20010215; JP 2001072340 A 20010321; JP 4700175 B2 20110615; US 6298647 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-08-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005306 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUESTERS, GERARD

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUESKENS, HERBERT

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEVENS, ULRICH

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUH, WOLF-MICHAEL

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHATTON, SIEGFRIED

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEUBIG, OTTMAR

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI