Global patent index - EP 1076031 A1

EP 1076031 A1 2001-02-14 - Protection device for a moving walk way or for an escalator

Title (en)

Protection device for a moving walk way or for an escalator

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung für einen Fahrsteig oder eine Fahrtreppe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour un tapis roulant ou pour un escalier roulant

Publication

EP 1076031 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116498 A

Priority

  • EP 00116498 A
  • EP 99810716 A

Abstract (en)

The security installations incorporate guide pieces (7) which act as protection for the balustrades (3) before and or after the balustrade bases in the direction of travel (F) and are located in the floor (4,5) to one side in the access and or exit areas. The installation elements are detachably fixed by at least one screw to the floor or stuck down.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schutzvorrichtung für einen Fahrsteig oder eine Fahrtreppe mit seitlichen Balustraden (3) und Balustradensockeln (3.1) sowie mit Leitmitteln zum Führen von von Fahrgästen mitgeführten Gegenständen, vorzugsweise Einkaufswagen oder Rollkoffer, wobei die Leitmittel als Einweiserelemente (7') ausgebildet sind, die zum Schutz der Balustraden (3) vor und/oder nach dem Balustradensockel (3.1)in Fahrrichtung (F) seitlich im Zugangs- und /oder Austrittsbereich am Boden (4) angebracht sind. Die Einkaufswagen (6) werden durch die Einweiserelemente(7') so geführt, dass sie die Balustrade nicht berühren und beschädigen können. Die Einweiser (7') können am Boden mittels Schrauben lösbar befestigt werden. Die Schutzvorrichtung kann für horizontale oder geneigte Fahrsteige, aber auch für Fahrtreppen verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 31/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076031 A1 20010214; EP 1076031 B1 20050420

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI