Global Patent Index - EP 1076088 A1

EP 1076088 A1 2001-02-14 - Process for cleaning textile

Title (en)

Process for cleaning textile

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen von Textilien

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage de textiles

Publication

EP 1076088 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119749 A

Priority

KR 19990032449 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a process for cleaning textiles, which comprises applying a composition comprising a low molecular weight linear siloxane represented by the formula: CH3((CH3)2SiO)nSi(CH3)2CH3 wherein n is an integer from 1 to 7, and a cationic surfactant to stained textiles and heating it in the presence of an inorganic base compound at a temperature below which the textiles are deteriorated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/16; C11D 1/38; C11D 3/04; C11D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/38 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/16 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 1/38 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/162 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076088 A1 20010214; EP 1076088 B1 20040526; KR 20010017103 A 20010305

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051006

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI