Global Patent Index - EP 1076101 A2

EP 1076101 A2 2001-02-14 - Method and device for folding piles of sheets

Title (en)

Method and device for folding piles of sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Falzen von Blattstapeln

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour plier des piles de feuilles

Publication

EP 1076101 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112062 A

Priority

IT VE990034 A

Abstract (en)

A method for folding piles of flexible objects in sheet form, in particular skins, characterised by causing the pile of objects to descend progressively, starting from its central part, through a transverse gap (18) provided in the pile-forming belt conveyor (16), the pile, which is folded into two parts as it descends, being collected on a moving underlying collection belt conveyor (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/36 (2006.01); B65H 45/04 (2006.01); C14B 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/04 (2013.01); B65H 29/36 (2013.01); C14B 1/62 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4227 (2013.01); B65H 2701/178 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076101 A2 20010214; EP 1076101 A3 20010613; IT 1311798 B1 20020319; IT VE990034 A1 20010212

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 14B 1/62 A, 7B 65H 45/04 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI