Global Patent Index - EP 1076123 A1

EP 1076123 A1 2001-02-14 - Method and device for centrifugal spinning

Title (en)

Method and device for centrifugal spinning

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zentrifugenspinnen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le filage centrifuge

Publication

EP 1076123 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114596 A

Priority

DE 19938433 A

Abstract (en)

For centrifugal yarn spinning, a number of spinning stations each have their dedicated drawing units to deliver drawn sliver through tubes to the spinning centrifuges. At the start of a spinning cycle by the spinning machine (10), the separate spinning stations are checked for the presence of yarn debris. The rotating frequency of the yarn leg (20) is measured at the separate spinning stations, for comparison with a nominal rotating frequency. The rotating frequency is monitored by a sensor (28) which registers the movement of the yarn (18), and the rotating frequency is established proportional to the rotating frequency of the yarn balloon. The rotating frequency is filtered out of the noise signal representing the yarn movement. The filtered frequency signal is analyzed, especially by a fast Fourier transformation. For the comparison, nominal values are taken from known geometric measurements and especially the known radius of an empty centrifuge. The rotating frequency is measured at the rotating yarn legs of all the spinning stations (12) simultaneously, at the spinning machine, and compared with each other. On detection of yarn debris (30) in a spinning centrifuge, the sliver stop (54) is activated at the drawing unit for that spinning station (12). An Independent claim is included for a centrifugal spinning machine with a sensor (28) at each spinning station to register physical values during a spinning cycle. These measurements are used to determine the loading condition of each spinning centrifuge (14).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Zentrifugenspinnmaschine, die über eine Vielzahl von gleichartigen Arbeitsstellen verfügt. Die Arbeitsstellen weisen dabei jeweils ein Streckwerk mit einer Luntenstoppeinrichtung, eine mit hoher Drehzahl um eine Achse rotierenden Spinnzentrifuge sowie einen rohrförmigen, changierbaren Fadenführer auf. Der aus der Fadenführermündung austretende, einen umlaufenden Garnschenkel bildende Faden wird;wie üblich, als Spinnkuchen auf der Innenwandung der Spinnzentrifuge abgelegt. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß daß zu Beginn des Spinnzyklus' der Spinnmaschine (10) die einzelnen Spinnzentrifugen (14) der Spinnmaschine auf Garnkörperreste (30) hin überprüft werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/08; D01H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/08 (2006.01); D01H 1/36 (2006.01); D01H 4/04 (2006.01); D01H 7/74 (2006.01); D01H 9/06 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/16 (2013.01); D01H 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076123 A1 20010214; EP 1076123 B1 20040331; CN 1225576 C 20051102; CN 1284576 A 20010221; CZ 20002932 A3 20010314; CZ 300010 B6 20090114; DE 19938433 A1 20010215; JP 2001081634 A 20010327; RU 2000120955 A 20020820; US 6389788 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005862 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI