Global Patent Index - EP 1076128 A2

EP 1076128 A2 2001-02-14 - A tumble dryer

Title (en)

A tumble dryer

Title (de)

Trommeltrockner

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge à tambour

Publication

EP 1076128 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306416 A

Priority

GB 9917494 A

Abstract (en)

A tumble dryer having an electric heating element 10 switched between first and second states in a regular repetitive cycle. In the preferred embodiment the heating element 10 is switched either fully on or fully off by a relay 24 according to a pulse width modulation control by a microprocessor 21. Advantageously, the effective heater output is continuously variable to any desired level. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2013.01); D06F 2058/289 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 0018315 D0 20000913; GB 2352498 A 20010131; EP 1076128 A2 20010214; EP 1076128 A3 20021211; GB 9917494 D0 19990929

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI