Global patent index - EP 1076129 A2

EP 1076129 A2 2001-02-14 - Wool treatment agent

Title (en)

Wool treatment agent

Title (de)

Veredlungsmittel für Wolle

Title (fr)

Agent pour le traitement de la laine

Publication

EP 1076129 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305614 A

Priority

JP 22483599 A

Abstract (en)

A wool treatment agent is disclosed herein which is characterized by the fact that said agent is an aqueous emulsion composition consisting of (A) an amino-group containing organopolysiloxane, (B) a nonionic emulsifying agent with an HLB of less than 15, (C) a nonionic emulsifying agent with an HLB of 15 or greater, and (D) water. The present invention introduces a wool treatment agent that shows superior stability against ionic substances, and is useful as an anti-shrinkage finishing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/643

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D06M 15/643 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/6436 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D06M 2101/12 (2013.01); D06M 2200/45 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076129 A2 20010214; EP 1076129 A3 20010328; AU 5188300 A 20010215; KR 20010050015 A 20010615; NZ 506208 A 20020201

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030602

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI