Global patent index - EP 1076129 A3

EP 1076129 A3 2001-03-28 - Wool treatment agent

Title (en)

Wool treatment agent

Title (de)

Veredlungsmittel für Wolle

Title (fr)

Agent pour le traitement de la laine

Publication

EP 1076129 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00305614 A

Priority

JP 22483599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1076129A2] A wool treatment agent is disclosed herein which is characterized by the fact that said agent is an aqueous emulsion composition consisting of (A) an amino-group containing organopolysiloxane, (B) a nonionic emulsifying agent with an HLB of less than 15, (C) a nonionic emulsifying agent with an HLB of 15 or greater, and (D) water. The present invention introduces a wool treatment agent that shows superior stability against ionic substances, and is useful as an anti-shrinkage finishing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/643

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D06M 15/643 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/6436 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D06M 2101/12 (2013.01); D06M 2200/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076129 A2 20010214; EP 1076129 A3 20010328; AU 5188300 A 20010215; KR 20010050015 A 20010615; NZ 506208 A 20020201

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030602

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI