Global Patent Index - EP 1076132 A1

EP 1076132 A1 2001-02-14 - Paper manufacturing process including a step for fixing of mineral fiuller on cellulosic fibres

Title (en)

Paper manufacturing process including a step for fixing of mineral fiuller on cellulosic fibres

Title (de)

Papierherstellungsverfahren mit Fixierung von Mineralfüllstoff auf cellulosischen Fasern

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille de papier comprenant la fixation d'une charge minérale sur des fibres cellulosiques

Publication

EP 1076132 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402058 A

Priority

EP 99402058 A

Abstract (en)

To bond a charge of a mineral material to the cellulose fibers in a suspension, the fiber suspension as a papermaking pulp contains at least hydrogen carbonates, carbonates or alkaline metal silicates and/or alkaline earths together with a reagent. The bonding material for attachment to the fibers is added as a mineral hydroxide for precipitation of its carbonates or silicates on to the fibers. The fiber suspension contains sodium hydrogen carbonates and also calcium hydrogen carbonates and/or magnesium hydrogen carbonates. The alkali content is completed at 2-30 degrees F. The fiber suspension contains ions of sodium (N+) at a rate of 20-1000 ppm, or ions of calcium (Ca<2> (+) ) at a rate of 5-200 ppm and/or magnesium ions (Mg<2> (+) ) at a rate of 5-200 ppm. The hydroxide mineral charge is a calcium hydroxide either as a concentrated milk or in solid form with a particle size of 6 mu m. After the mineral material has precipitated on to the fibers in the suspension, a gas is injected into the suspension containing a carbon dioxide to neutralize and stabilize the pH value of the cellulose fiber suspension. The fiber suspension used is supplied as a pulp of chemically bleached or unbleached fibers, a mechanical pulp, a thermomechanical pulp, or mixtures of pulp types. An Independent claim is included for the production of paper sheets from the pulp of a fiber suspension where mineral materials have been deposited on to the fibers. The wet pulp is fed to a papermaking machine, and the wet sheets are dried.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé pour fixer une charge minérale sur des fibres cellulosiques en suspension aqueuse. Selon l'invention, ce procédé consiste à utiliser comme milieu réactionnel une suspension aqueuse de fibres cellulosiques issue d'une fabrication papetière, comprenant au moins des hydrogénocarbonates, carbonates ou silicates de métaux alcalins et/ou alcalino-terreux et à ajouter audit milieu réactionnel, un hydroxyde de la charge minérale, pour précipiter des carbonates ou silicates de la charge minérale sur les fibres. L'invention trouve notamment application dans la fabrication du papier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/70; D21C 9/00; D21H 17/67

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 17/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/00 (2013.01); D21C 9/004 (2013.01); D21C 11/0035 (2013.01); D21H 17/675 (2013.01); D21H 17/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076132 A1 20010214; EP 1076132 B1 20081126; AT 415518 T 20081215; CA 2381356 A1 20010222; CA 2381356 C 20090428; DE 69939978 D1 20090108; DK 1076132 T3 20090316; EP 2058434 A1 20090513; ES 2318885 T3 20090501; NO 20020711 A 20020415; NO 20020711 D0 20020212; NO 331185 B1 20111024; PT 1076132 E 20090224; TR 200200375 T2 20020821; US 6706148 B1 20040316; WO 0112899 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090813

2010-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2318885

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-03-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20090400557

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2009-03-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2009-03-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2009-02-24 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090216

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69939978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-01-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-12-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PAPER MANUFACTURING PROCESS INCLUDING A STEP FOR FIXING OF MINERAL FIULLER ON CELLULOSIC FIBRES

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI