Global Patent Index - EP 1076140 A1

EP 1076140 A1 2001-02-14 - Closure actuator for the wings of windows, doors or the like, particularly for sliding wings

Title (en)

Closure actuator for the wings of windows, doors or the like, particularly for sliding wings

Title (de)

Verschlussbetätiger für Flügel von Fenstern, Türen od. dgl., insbesondere von Schiebeflügeln

Title (fr)

Actionneur de fermeture pour battants de fenêtres, portes ou similaires, notamment pour battants coulissants

Publication

EP 1076140 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115810 A

Priority

DE 19937401 A

Abstract (en)

A fixture plate (10) in which a control bolt (30) is pivot mounted is fixed to the casement or leaf frame (11). The bolt's front end (31) is joined to a handle (20) and its back end to closure pieces (33). An edge strip in the end part of the fixture plate rests against the plate edge, and prevents the handle from being turned. A head piece (35) on the upper side of the fixture plate protrudes from the bearing parts (18) of the control bolt. The handle has a radial guide (22) for the head piece.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verschlussbetätiger für Schiebeflügel wird an den Flügelrahmen (11) eine Befestigungsplatte (10) befestigt, in welcher ein Steuerbolzen (30) drehgelagert ist. Das vordere Bolzenende (31) ist mit einer Handhabe (20) verbunden. Um eine kurze axiale Bauhöhe zu erreichen, wird die Handhabe (20) im Endabschnitt mit einer Randleiste (21) versehen, die an einem Endabschnitt (15) der Befestigungsplatte (10) zur Anlage kommt, wenn sich die Handhabe (20) in ihrer Ruhestellung befindet. Dann ist eine Drehbetätigung der Handhabe (20) ausgeschlossen. Die Drehbetätigung ist möglich, wenn die Handhabe (20) in ihre Arbeitsstellung verschoben worden ist, weil dann die Randleiste (21) den anschlagwirksamen Plattenrand freigibt. Ein drehfest und axialfest am Steuerbolzen (30) sitzendes Kopfstück (35) ragt auf der Oberseite der Befestigungsplatte (10) heraus und ist in einer Radialführung (22) der Handhabe (20) axialfest und drehfest aufgenommen. Durch die Radialführung (22) lässt sich die Handhabe (20) zwischen der Ruhestellung in die Arbeitsstellung radial versetzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/0092 (2013.01); E05B 1/003 (2013.01); E05B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076140 A1 20010214; EP 1076140 B1 20040602; DE 19937401 C1 20010301; ES 2216778 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BUSE MENTZEL LUDEWIG PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 50006665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110723

2013-08-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130822

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110722

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216778

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI