Global Patent Index - EP 1076143 A1

EP 1076143 A1 2001-02-14 - Household appliance with a locking element

Title (en)

Household appliance with a locking element

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einem Verriegelungselement

Title (fr)

Appareil électroménager avec un élément de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1076143 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116041 A

Priority

DE 19937625 A

Abstract (en)

The locking assembly, especially for domestic appliances, has a mounting section (8), a locking bolt (10) and a spring elastic bending link (12) between them. A push button (18) gives a manual movement of the locking bolt (10) against the spring force for release against the locking direction (14) of bolt movement. The mounting (8), bolt (10) and connecting link are in a one-piece body of the same material, such as of plastics or sheet plate.

Abstract (de)

Verriegelungselement enthaltend einen Befestigungsteil (8), einen Riegel (10), einen den Befestigungsteil mit dem Riegel verbindenden, federelastisch biegbaren Verbindungsteil (12), und einen Druckknopf (18) zum manuellen Bewegen des Riegels (10) entgegen der Federkraft entgegen der Verriegelungsbewegungsrichtung (14) in eine Entriegelungsstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 19/06; E05C 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076143 A1 20010214; EP 1076143 B1 20070912; DE 19937625 A1 20010215; DE 50014646 D1 20071025; ES 2292391 T3 20080316

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110727

2012-12-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110726

2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014646

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-04-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292391 T3

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014646 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH A LOCKING ELEMENT

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020227

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI