Global Patent Index - EP 1076149 A2

EP 1076149 A2 2001-02-14 - Door leaf for upwards or sidewards moving sectional door

Title (en)

Door leaf for upwards or sidewards moving sectional door

Title (de)

Torblatt eines Decke- oder Seitensektionaltors

Title (fr)

Vantail de porte sectionnelle à déplacement vertical ou latéral

Publication

EP 1076149 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116268 A

Priority

DE 19937766 A

Abstract (en)

The panel of a sectional door consists of interlinked flat sections (1) which have transverse, integrated hinge and reinforcement profiles running parallel with the swivel axes and possessing continuous ridges molded on them. The ridges are hooked into each other in pairs for forming a lengthwise hinge which is continuous over the entire length. Each section consists of a single metal sheet which, on each lengthwise side, is bent over to form an outward protruding double-layered folded lug, with inter-hooking hooks (13,14).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Torblatt eines Decken- oder Seitensektionaltors, insbesondere für PKW-Garagen oder für Hallen, aus gelenkig miteinander verbundenen Sektionen, die parallel zu den Schwenkachsen verlaufende, quergerichtete integrierte Scharnier- und Aussteifungsprofile mit angeformten Wulsten aufweisen, welche zur Bildung eines durchgehenden Längsscharniers paarweise ineinandergehakt sind. Damit die Sektionen nicht mit einzeln zu montierenden Scharnieren miteinander verbunden werden müssen und diese auf einer modernen Abkantpresse mit nur zwei Werkzeugen rationell hergestellt werden können, ist vorgesehen, daß die Sektionen aus einer einzigen Blechtafel (3) bestehen, die an jeder Längsseite zu einer nach außen abstehenden doppellagigen Falzfahne (30) umgebogen ist, und daß die Falzfahnen (30) zu durchgehenden komplementären Gelenkhaken (13,14) abgekantet und ineinandergehakt sind. Mit Abstand von den Gelenkhaken können geschlossene Kastenprofile (25) ausgebildet sein, die mit Isolierstoff ausgefüllt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/486 (2013.01); E06B 3/485 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076149 A2 20010214; EP 1076149 A3 20010516; CN 1283734 A 20010214; DE 19937766 A1 20010315; DE 19937766 C2 20010628; HU 0003271 A2 20010528; HU 0003271 A3 20020328; HU 0003271 D0 20001028; PL 341929 A1 20010212

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 3/48 A, 7E 06B 9/15 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI