Global Patent Index - EP 1076156 A2

EP 1076156 A2 2001-02-14 - Early evaluation system for a cased wellbore

Title (en)

Early evaluation system for a cased wellbore

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Frühbewertung eines verrohrten Bohrlochs

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évaluation précoce d'un puits cuvelé

Publication

EP 1076156 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306849 A

Priority

US 37418499 A

Abstract (en)

An early evaluation system for use in a cased wellbore (12) is disclosed. An apparatus (10) comprises: a tool string (18); a perforating gun (20) on a lower end of the tool string (18); a packer (24), carried on the tool string (18), having a set position for sealingly closing a well annulus between the tool string (18) and the cased wellbore (12); a control valve (26) disposed in the tool string (18) operably controlling fluid flow therethrough; a sampler (28) disposed in the tool string (18) and in communication with the control valve (26); and a locating device (36) disposed within the tool string (18) for selectively positioning the tool string (18) adjacent to a formation (16). When the tool string (18) is positioned adjacent the formation (16), the packer (24) is set and the control valve (26) is in communication with the formation (16), and formation fluid will flow from the formation (16) into the sampler (28) after opening the control valve (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/116 (2006.01); E21B 47/09 (2012.01); E21B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/081 (2013.01); E21B 43/116 (2013.01); E21B 47/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076156 A2 20010214; EP 1076156 A3 20020227; AU 5194200 A 20010215; CA 2315482 A1 20010213; NO 20004008 A 20010214; NO 20004008 D0 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-12-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI