Global Patent Index - EP 1076162 A2

EP 1076162 A2 2001-02-14 - Electromagnetic valve drive mechanism for a piston engine lift valve

Title (en)

Electromagnetic valve drive mechanism for a piston engine lift valve

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch betätigter Ventiltrieb für ein Hubventil einer Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande électromagnétique de soupape pour un moteur à piston

Publication

EP 1076162 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115285 A

Priority

DE 19938451 A

Abstract (en)

The valve drive has a valve shaft (1') carrying an armature plate (6) oscillating between two electromagnetic coils with two opposing oscillating springs (8a,8b). The armature plate is supported on the valve shaft directly for an opening movement and via a spring element (10) ensuring compensation of valve play in the closing direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektromagnetisch betätigten Ventiltrieb für ein Hubventil einer Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine, wobei der Ventilschaft des Hubventiles eine oszillierend zwischen zwei Elektromagnetspulen bewegbare Ankerplatte trägt, an der einander entgegengerichtet zwei Schwinger-Federn angreifen. Erfindungsgemäß stützt sich die Ankerplatte bei einer Öffnungsbewegung des Hubventiles direkt und bei einer Schließbewegung des Hubventiles unter Zwischenschaltung eines den Ventilspielausgleich gewährleistenden Federelementes am Ventilschaft ab. Bevorzugt ist der Ventilschaft mit einer Abstützhülse versehen, wobei zwischen der Abstützhülse und der Ankerplatte das den Ventilspielausgleich gewährleistende Federelement eingespannt ist. Die Abstützhülse ist mehrteilig ausgebildet, wobei ein die Ankerplatte durchdringendes Hülsenteil endseitig mit einem Bund versehen ist, der auf der dem Ventilteller des Hubventiles zugewandten Seite der Ankerplatte anliegen kann, während auf dem anderen Ende des Hülsenteiles ein mit dem Federelement zusammenwirkender Abstützteller aufliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/08 (2006.01); F01L 3/10 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/10 (2013.01); F01L 3/08 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F01L 2103/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076162 A2 20010214; EP 1076162 A3 20011114; DE 19938451 A1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI