Global Patent Index - EP 1076171 A2

EP 1076171 A2 2001-02-14 - Valve for dosing the admission of volatilized fuel in an intake conduit of a combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve for dosing the admission of volatilized fuel in an intake conduit of a combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventil zum dosierten Einleiten von verflüchtigtem Brennstoff in einen Ansaugkanal einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Soupape pour l'admission dosée de carburant volatil dans un canal d'admission d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1076171 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116821 A

Priority

DE 19937722 A

Abstract (en)

The valve has a valve closure element between a valve seat body (27) and a magnetic core (25) acted upon by a closing restoring mechanism and by an electromagnet (20) in the opening direction. A further electromagnet (30) arranged in a current path parallel with the valve's electromagnet actuates a further valve closure element with associated valve seat body (37), magnetic core (35) and restoring mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Ein Ventil zum dosierten Einleiten von aus dem Brennstofftank einer Brennkraftmaschine verflüchtigtem Brennstoff in einen Ansaugkanal der Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem zwischen einem Ventilsitzkörper (27) und einem Magnetkern (25) eines Elektromagneten (20) angeordneten Ventilschließglied, das von einem Rückstellmittel in Ventilschließrichtung beaufschlagt und vom Elektromagneten (20) in Ventilöffnungsrichtung betätigbar ist, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass in einem parallel zu dem Elektromagneten (20) angeordneten Strömungspfad wenigstens ein weiterer Elektromagnet (30) angeordnet ist, durch den ein weiteres, zwischen einem weiteren Ventilsitzkörper (37) und einem weiteren Magnetkern (35) des weiteren Elektromagneten (30) angeordnetes und von einem weiteren Rückstellmittel in Ventilschließrichtung beaufschlagbares Ventilschließglied in Ventilöffnungsrichtung betätigbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/0836 (2013.01); F02M 2025/0845 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076171 A2 20010214; EP 1076171 A3 20011004; DE 19937722 A1 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040513

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI