Global Patent Index - EP 1076174 A2

EP 1076174 A2 2001-02-14 - Single cylinder high pressure pump

Title (en)

Single cylinder high pressure pump

Title (de)

Einzylinder-Hochdruckpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe monocylindre à haute pression

Publication

EP 1076174 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116573 A

Priority

DE 19938504 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a pump element in a pump housing (1) with a pump piston (5) reciprocally movable in a cylinder (4) against spring (7) bias force and driven by a cam (8) to feed fuel subject to high pressure into a rail. A mounting opening (3) for the pump element is arranged in the pump housing on the side remote from the cam drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einzylinder-Hochdruckpumpe zur Hochdruckversorgung in Common-Rail-Einspritzsystemen von Brennkraftmaschinen, mit einem in einem Pumpengehäuse (1) aufgenommenen Pumpenelement, das einen Pumpenkolben (5) umfasst, der in einem Pumpenzylinder (4) gegen die Vorspannkraft einer Druckfeder (7) hin und her bewegbar aufgenommen und durch einen Nocken (8) angetrieben ist, um mit Hochdruck beaufschlagten Kraftstoff in ein Rail zu fördern. Um die Lebensdauer der Einzylinder-Hochdruckpumpe zu verlängern, ist auf der vom Nockenantrieb (8) abgewandten Seite in dem Pumpengehäuse (1) eine Montageöffnung (3) zur Aufnahme des Pumpenelements vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/44; F02M 59/10; F02M 59/48; F02M 63/02; F04B 53/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 59/48 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 11/00 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/48 (2013.01); F02M 59/02 (2013.01); F02M 59/102 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F04B 1/0421 (2013.01); F04B 11/0016 (2013.01); F04B 53/168 (2013.01); F02M 2200/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076174 A2 20010214; EP 1076174 A3 20031119; EP 1076174 B1 20051102; DE 19938504 A1 20010308; DE 50011493 D1 20051208; JP 2001073907 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011493

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2006-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061222

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-05-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011493 P 20051208

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/44 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/48 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/10 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 53/16 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI