Global Patent Index - EP 1076201 A1

EP 1076201 A1 2001-02-14 - Method for transporting naptha in a crude oil pipe line

Title (en)

Method for transporting naptha in a crude oil pipe line

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Transportieren von Naphta in einer Rohölrohrleitung

Title (fr)

Procédé de transport de naphta dans un oléoduc de pétrole brut

Publication

EP 1076201 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402244 A

Priority

FR 9910322 A

Abstract (en)

Naphtha is transported using a pipeline also used for transporting crude oil. The naphtha is supplied to the pipeline in batches preceded and followed by batches of condensate. At the receiving end the pipeline each bath of naphtha is recovered after the leading interface of naphtha and condensate arrives and before the trailing interface arrives. An Independent claim is included for the naphtha supplied to and recovered from a pipeline as above. Preferred Features: The condensate is distilled from crude oil or natural gas between 30 degrees C and 200-350 degrees C. Each batch of condensate is 1500 m<3> and preferably 4500 m<3>. The batches of condensate need not be the same size. The naphtha/condensate interfaces are detected by a densitometry and/or a colorimeter.

Abstract (fr)

Ce procédé de transport d'un lot de naphta dans un oléoduc dont la destination première est de transporter du pétrole brut, est caractérisé par le fait que l'on fait cheminer dans l'oléoduc le lot de naphta encadré par des lots de condensats, à savoir un lot de condensat de tête et un lot de condensat de queue, et, à l'arrivée, on récupère le lot de naphta entre un moment de situant au plus tôt à la fin ou sensiblement à la fin du passage de la zone interface condensat de tête/naphta et un moment se situant au plus tard au début ou sensiblement au début de l'apparition de la zone interface naphta/condensat de queue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17D 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/08 (2006.01); C10G 9/36 (2006.01); C10G 73/02 (2006.01); F17D 3/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17D 3/05 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0391 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3209771 A 19651005 - GOGARTY WILLIAM B, et al
  • [A] DE 1255413 B 19671130 - CONTINENTAL OIL CO
  • [AD] BAUM JUDY S. ET AL: "Batching, treating keys to moving refined products in crude-oil line", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL., 5 October 1998 (1998-10-05), PENNWELL PUBLISHING CO. TULSA., US, pages 49 - 55, XP002135547, ISSN: 0030-1388
  • [A] ZACHARIAS ELLIS M.: "Sonic detectors see gasoline interfaces", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL., vol. 96, no. 40, 21 August 1972 (1972-08-21), PENNWELL PUBLISHING CO. TULSA., US, pages 79 - 81, XP002135548, ISSN: 0030-1388

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076201 A1 20010214; EP 1076201 B1 20031029; AT 253197 T 20031115; CA 2315948 A1 20010209; CA 2315948 C 20031007; CN 1097691 C 20030101; CN 1284620 A 20010221; DE 60006194 D1 20031204; DE 60006194 T2 20040729; FR 2797491 A1 20010216; FR 2797491 B1 20010914; JP 2001108200 A 20010420; JP 3427264 B2 20030714; KR 20010061922 A 20010707; NO 20003983 A 20010212; NO 20003983 D0 20000807; US 6582591 B1 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070814

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20050617

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ARKEMA

2005-06-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040808

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031029

2004-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006194 P 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI