Global Patent Index - EP 1076206 A1

EP 1076206 A1 2001-02-14 - Method for processing furnace-bottom residue produced in gasification and slagging combustion furnace

Title (en)

Method for processing furnace-bottom residue produced in gasification and slagging combustion furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von Ofenbodenrückständen von Vergasung und Verschlackungsöfen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement des résidus de fond de fours de gazeification et scorification

Publication

EP 1076206 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00117221 A

Priority

  • JP 22913599 A
  • JP 25936499 A
  • JP 25936599 A

Abstract (en)

A gasification and slagging combustion furnace comprises a fluidized-bed gasification furnace (1) as a preceding stage and a slagging combustion furnace (2) as a succeeding stage. The recovered fluidized medium (d) is transferred to the fluidized-bed gasification furnace where the fluidized medium is reused. A metal component (a,b,c) is separated and recovered from the furnace-bottom residue. A nonmetal component is utilized after matter comprising the nonmetal component is rubbed with one another to remove contaminants from the surface of the matter, or after removing by a screen a powder component contained inherently in the nonmetal component and a powder component produced upon crushing of the nonmetal component. Alternatively, a nonmetal component is crushed to produce powder (e), the produced powder is transferred to the fluidized-bed gasification furnace, and then to the slagging combustion furnace where slagging is performed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 10/26; F23C 10/10; C10J 3/52; C10J 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/54 (2006.01); F23C 10/10 (2006.01); F23C 10/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10J 3/463 (2013.01); F23C 10/10 (2013.01); F23C 10/26 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1628 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1631 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076206 A1 20010214; CN 1185438 C 20050119; CN 1284623 A 20010221; KR 20010021279 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050924

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI