Global Patent Index - EP 1076209 A2

EP 1076209 A2 2001-02-14 - Control circuit for a gas valve

Title (en)

Control circuit for a gas valve

Title (de)

Steuerschaltung für ein Gasventil

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande pour une soupape à gaz

Publication

EP 1076209 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116681 A

Priority

AT 136099 A

Abstract (en)

The control circuit can be switched on by mains lines (1,2) leading via a relay contact (3), contg. fuses (F1, F2) and fed via switch contacts (S1-1, S1-2). The arrangement also has an earth line (9). The relay contact forms a changeover device and short circuits the gas valve (6) in the off condition of the relay controlling the relay contact.

Abstract (de)

Steuerschaltung für ein Gasventil (6), das mit über einen Relaiskontakt (3) eines Relais (K3) an mit Sicherungen (F1, F2) versehenen und über Schaltkontakte (S1-1, S1-2) geführte Netzzuleitungen (1, 2) anschaltbar ist, wobei eine Erdleitung (9) vorgesehen ist. Um eine eigensichere Steuerschaltung zu erreichen, ist vorgesehen, daß der Relaiskontakt (3) als Wechsler ausgebildet ist, und in der abgefallenen Stellung des den Relaiskontakt (3) steuernden Relais (K3) das Gasventil (6) kurzschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/245 (2013.01); F23N 5/26 (2013.01); F23N 2031/10 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076209 A2 20010214; EP 1076209 A3 20030312; AT 407914 B 20010725; AT A136099 A 20001115; DE 10038735 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060714

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT GMBH

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI