Global patent index - EP 1076220 A2

EP 1076220 A2 2001-02-14 - Refrigerated cabinet

Title (en)

Refrigerated cabinet

Title (de)

Kühlmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble frigorifique

Publication

EP 1076220 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116833 A

Priority

DE 29913806 U

Abstract (en)

A method for producing surfaces which inhibit the build-up of grease and water in chilled conditions has the surface roughened to an ultra- or nano degree. This prevents water from wetting the surface thus rolling off before freezing. The surface also inhibits the adhesion of grease films, which are easily washed off with water. The surface treatment can be produced by etching or by mechanical polishing. A similar effect can be obtained by coating with a special paint.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befaßt sich bei Kühlmöbeln mit dem Problem, die durch die Lagerung der Waren und deren Kühlung entstehenden Verschmutzungen im Bereich der Verdampfer, Wannen oder dergleichen leichter säubern zu können. Zur Lösung dieses Problems wird vorgeschlagen, die Oberflächen von Verdampfern, Wannen oder dergleichen mit der Ware in Berührung kommenden Gegenständen mit einer stark zerklüfteten Oberflächenstruktur in einer Rauhigkeit im Ultra- oder Nanobereich zu versehen, die eine abweisende Funktion gegenüber Schmutz, Fett oder sonstigen Verunreinigungen aufweist. Dadurch wird die Möglichkeit geschaffen, Schmutz und Fettpartikel durch einfaches Abspülen mit Wasser wegzuschwemmen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 19/00; A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F28F 13/04 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/04 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); F25B 39/02 (2013.01); F25D 25/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3843688 A1 19891123 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913806 U1 20000921; EP 1076220 A2 20010214; EP 1076220 A3 20011121

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI