Global Patent Index - EP 1076266 A1

EP 1076266 A1 2001-02-14 - Black toner

Title (en)

Black toner

Title (de)

Schwarzer Toner

Title (fr)

Révélateur noir

Publication

EP 1076266 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306818 A

Priority

  • JP 22782699 A
  • JP 2000131864 A

Abstract (en)

A black toner comprises a binder resin and black non-magnetic composite particles having an average particle diameter of 0.06 to 1.0 mu m and comprising: (a) hematite particles or iron oxide hydroxide particles as core particles; (b) a coating layer on the surface of said hematite particles or iron oxide hydroxide particles, comprising at least one organosilicon compound selected from: (1) organosilane compounds obtainable from alkoxysilane compounds, and (2) polysiloxanes or modified polysiloxanes; and (c) a carbon black coat which is provided on said coating layer in an amount of 26 to 55 parts by weight based on 100 parts by weight of said hematite particles or iron oxide hydroxide particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01G 49/02 (2006.01); C01G 49/06 (2006.01); G03G 9/083 (2006.01); G03G 9/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/0838 (2013.01); G03G 9/0839 (2013.01); G03G 9/0902 (2013.01); G03G 9/0904 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0453261 A1 19911023 - TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]
  • [A] US 5324571 A 19940628 - KOYAMA NOBORU [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0582472 A1 19940209 - TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199020, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E05, AN 1990-152560, XP002149694
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 21 (P - 048) 7 February 1981 (1981-02-07)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076266 A1 20010214; JP 2001117283 A 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB LU NL

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU NL

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI