Global patent index - EP 1076271 A1

EP 1076271 A1 2001-02-14 - Toner cartridge

Title (en)

Toner cartridge

Title (de)

Tonerkartusche

Title (fr)

Cartouche de toner

Publication

EP 1076271 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00116799 A

Priority

US 37110999 A

Abstract (en)

A cartridge for the replenishment of dry toner in an image forming apparatus, such as a copier or printer, has a cylindrical container and a mechanism to move toner uniformly toward a discharge opening for delivery to a toner storage region of the image forming apparatus. As the container is rotated about its longitudinal axis, a slidable wall rotates with respect to the container or a stationary threaded center rod or lead screw. The slidable wall then translates itself down the lead screw, axially displacing itself and displacing toner or developer into the storage region of the image forming machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0872 (2013.01); G03G 15/0855 (2013.01); G03G 15/0865 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5208637 A 19930504 - LANDA BENZION [CA]
  • [XY] US 3973699 A 19760810 - COOK JOHN H
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 322 (P - 902) 20 July 1989 (1989-07-20)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 193 (P - 1349) 11 May 1992 (1992-05-11)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076271 A1 20010214; JP 2001092230 A 20010406

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI