Global Patent Index - EP 1076326 A2

EP 1076326 A2 2001-02-14 - Method and communication system to control optimally a plurality of mobile stations to their destinations

Title (en)

Method and communication system to control optimally a plurality of mobile stations to their destinations

Title (de)

Verfahren und Kommunikationssytem zur optimierten Steuerung einer Vielzahl von mobilen Stationen zu Zielorten

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de communication pour la commande optimisée d'une pluralité de stations mobiles vers leurs destinations

Publication

EP 1076326 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117464 A

Priority

DE 19938454 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves determining the current position in each mobile station and generating position data, transmitting the position data from the mobile station to at least one co-ordination station, evaluating the position data and generating command data in the co-ordination station for optimizing movement of the mobile stations to the destinations and transmitting the command data to the mobile stations. An Independent claim is also included for a communications system for optimized control of mobile stations at destination points.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung schafft ein Verfahren zur optimierten Steuerung einer Vielzahl von mobilen Stationen (2, 3, 4, 5) zu Zielorten (7, 8, 9) mit den folgenden Schritten: (a) Ermitteln der aktuellen Position in jeder mobilen Station (2, 3, 4, 5) mittels einer Positionsbestimmungseinrichtung und Erzeugen von Positionsdaten; (b) Übermitteln der Positionsdaten von den mobilen Stationen (2, 3, 4, 5) zu mindestens einer Koordinierungsstation (1);(c) Auswerten der übermittelten Positionsdaten der mobilen Stationen (2, 3, 4, 5) und Erzeugen von Befehlsdaten zur Optimierung der Bewegungen der mobilen Stationen zu den jeweiligen Zielorten (7, 8, 9) in der Koordinierungsstation (1); (d) Übermitteln der Befehlsdaten von der Koordinierungsstation (1) zu den mobilen Stationen (2, 3, 4, 5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/123 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/202 (2013.01); G08G 1/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076326 A2 20010214; EP 1076326 A3 20021106; DE 19938454 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI