Global patent index - EP 1076342 A2

EP 1076342 A2 2001-02-14 - Cable

Title (en)

Cable

Title (de)

Kabel

Title (fr)

Câble

Publication

EP 1076342 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116826 A

Priority

DE 19938032 A

Abstract (en)

The cable (10) has a cable core enclosed by a casing within the exterior (32) of the cable. Retroreflective elements (22) are arranged in the external surface (32) of the cable which are visible by retroreflection through the external surface of the cable when light falls on the cable. Each retroreflective element contains an optical element and a reflector film.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Kabel umfassend eine Kabelseele und einen die Kabelseele umgebenden Mantel, welche innerhalb einer Außenseite des Kabels liegen, derart zu verbessern, daß es auch bei ungünstigen Lichtverhältnissen gut sichtbar ist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß innerhalb der Außenfläche des Kabels retroreflektierende Elemente angeordnet sind, welche bei Lichteinfall von außerhalb des Kabels durch die Außenfläche des Kabels hindurch retroreflektierend sichtbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076342 A2 20010214; EP 1076342 A3 20011107; EP 1076342 B1 20050216; DE 19938032 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI