Global patent index - EP 1076345 A2

EP 1076345 A2 2001-02-14 - Variable inductance element

Title (en)

Variable inductance element

Title (de)

Variables induktives Element

Title (fr)

Elément inductif variable

Publication

EP 1076345 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00402278 A

Priority

JP 22887999 A

Abstract (en)

A meandering inductor pattern (4) is formed on the upper surface of an insulating substrate (1). The inductor pattern (4) is formed by irradiating a conductor pattern (2) with a laser beam to form U-shaped trimming grooves (10) in the conductor pattern (2) in such a manner that two island-shape rectangular sections (3) are separated from the conductor pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/04; H01F 17/00; H01F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/08 (2006.01); H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 21/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/0006 (2013.01); H01F 41/045 (2013.01); H01F 21/00 (2013.01); H01F 2021/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076345 A2 20010214; EP 1076345 A3 20010307; JP 2001052927 A 20010223; KR 100370513 B1 20030129; KR 20010021286 A 20010315; TW 451229 B 20010821

INPADOC legal status

2009-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080809

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080129

2007-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000826

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI