Global Patent Index - EP 1076347 A3

EP 1076347 A3 2002-09-11 - Manual control device

Title (en)

Manual control device

Title (de)

Handbedienungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande manuelle

Publication

EP 1076347 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115381 A

Priority

DE 29914191 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1076347A2] The device has upper (3) and lower (1) housing parts, a circuit board (11) for accommodating switching elements, one or two batteries/accumulators (9a, 9b) for standby operation of drive functions and./or the hand controller current supply and a cable (13) and/or infrared transmitter for connecting the controller to the drive. The circuit board and/or housing upper part can be attached to the lower housing part in at least two different installed positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/02; A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/14 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/04 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0214 (2013.01); H01H 9/0235 (2013.01); H01H 9/04 (2013.01); H01H 11/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914191 U1 19991111; EP 1076347 A2 20010214; EP 1076347 A3 20020911; JP 2001119173 A 20010427; US 6693552 B1 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI