Global Patent Index - EP 1076381 A1

EP 1076381 A1 2001-02-14 - Switching and displaying device for the control technique

Title (en)

Switching and displaying device for the control technique

Title (de)

Schalt-/Anzeigegerät der Steuerungstechnik

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande et d' affichage pour la technique de commande

Publication

EP 1076381 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115856 A

Priority

DE 19938070 A

Abstract (en)

A switching-/display-device has at least one pair of contacts (7-9) to which can be connected to cable cores external of the device, in which contact pairs within the device can be electrically connected to one another or electrically isolated from one another via a switch (10,11), or electrically connected to one another via a binary display device (12). The pair of contacts (7-9) are arranged within a plug cavity (13) into which can be inserted a plug (14) consisting of at least two plug parts transferable from an open- to a closed- position. The cable cores (16) can make contact with the plug by inserting the cable cores (16) with their core-insulation into the plug (14) in the open position, with subsequent transference of the plug into the closed position.

Abstract (de)

Zur Verkabelung mit einer übergeordneten speicherprogrammierbaren Steuerung (2) ist bei einem Schalt-/Anzeigegeräts (6) mindestens ein Paar von Kontakten (7 bis 9) in einer Steckeraufnahme (13) angeordnet, in die ein Stecker (14) einführbar ist, der aus mindestens zwei Steckerteilen (17, 18) besteht, die von einer Öffnungs- in eine Schließstellung überführbar sind. Durch Einführen der Kabeladern (16) mit ihren Aderisolierungen in den Stecker (14) in der Öffnungsstellung und Überführen des Steckers (14) in die Schließstellung sind die Kabeladern (16) mit dem Stecker (14) kontaktierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08; G05B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/04 (2006.01); H01R 12/59 (2011.01); H01R 12/79 (2011.01); H05K 7/00 (2006.01); H05K 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/592 (2013.01); H01R 12/79 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076381 A1 20010214; EP 1076381 B1 20071212; DE 19938070 A1 20010315; DE 50014838 D1 20080124

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090724

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080710

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014838 P 20080124

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060629

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI