Global Patent Index - EP 1076436 A9

EP 1076436 A9 2001-04-25 - Route injection into a multicast routing table

Title (en)

Route injection into a multicast routing table

Title (de)

Routeinspritz in eine Mehrfachleitweglenkungstabelle

Title (fr)

Injection d'une route dans une table de routage multi-diffusion

Publication

EP 1076436 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00650091 A

Priority

US 37169499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1076436A2] A method transmits multicast datagrams. The method includes searching for a route entry for a source network in a first routing table and returning a signal for a match in response to finding a route entry for the source network in the first routing table of a multicast router. The method injects a route entry for the source network in a multicast routing table of the multicast router in response to a signal for a match. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/751 (2013.01); H04L 12/761 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 45/02 (2013.01); H04L 45/16 (2013.01)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1076436 A2 20010214; EP 1076436 A3 20010919; EP 1076436 A9 20010425; CA 2314642 A1 20010210

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DOONG, JANET

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DOBBU, VENKATESWARA R.

2005-09-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050713

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04L 12/18 A, 7H 04Q 3/66 B, 7H 04L 12/56 B

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI