Global Patent Index - EP 1076596 A1

EP 1076596 A1 2001-02-21 - MATERIAL FEED CONTAINER, ESPECIALLY FOR THICK MATTER PUMPS

Title (en)

MATERIAL FEED CONTAINER, ESPECIALLY FOR THICK MATTER PUMPS

Title (de)

MATERIALAUFGABEBEHÄLTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR DICKSTOFFPUMPEN

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR DELIVREUR DE MATERIAU, EN PARTICULIER POUR POMPES A SUBSTANCES EPAISSES

Publication

EP 1076596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922124 A

Priority

  • DE 19820509 A
  • EP 9902777 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820509A1] Material container for a concrete pump has a mixing screw forming a unit that is easily demountable for cleaning and maintenance. The equipment is part of a mobile concrete distributor. The container of concrete, from which material is dispensed by a pump along a pipeline to the point of use, is the subject of this patent. The material is agitated constantly by a helix (44) driven by a hydraulic motor (48) with shaft and associated bearings. The problem is access for cleaning and maintenance of these mechanical parts. The container is constructed in two main parts - a fixed base (38) and a moveable cover (40), which is connected to the base with four swing bolts (80). The agitator assembly is attached to the cover with a further four bolts at the bearing housings. All bolts are handled outside the container along the flange of the cover. The assembly is lowered into U-shaped brackets in the base and locked in position by bolts passing through the legs of the U, at right angles to, and across, the shaft and bearings. There is therefore a choice to swing the cover open about one set of swing bolts by disconnecting the assembly from it, or removing both cover and attached assembly by releasing all four swing bolts and removing the restraining bolts across the U-brackets. The former situation would arise for a cleaning wash whereas the second choice would be made when maintenance is required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00; B01F 7/02; E04G 21/04; F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/02 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01); E04G 21/04 (2006.01); F04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/00435 (2013.01); B01F 7/02 (2013.01); B01F 15/00019 (2013.01); E04G 21/04 (2013.01); F04B 15/023 (2013.01); B01F 2015/00616 (2013.01); Y10S 417/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958235A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820509 A1 19991111; EP 1076596 A1 20010221; EP 1076596 B1 20021211; ES 2188166 T3 20030616; JP 2002514496 A 20020521; US 6488477 B1 20021203; WO 9958235 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090410

2009-02-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-02-20 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2188166

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-23

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT