Global Patent Index - EP 1076647 A2

EP 1076647 A2 2001-02-21 - ANTIPSYCHOTIC INDOLYL DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

ANTIPSYCHOTIC INDOLYL DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

ANTIPSYCHOTISCH WIRKENDE INDOLYL-DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'INDOLYL PSYCHOTIQUES

Publication

EP 1076647 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99918863 A

Priority

  • US 9909132 W
  • US 6912998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955672A2] The present invention provides novel compounds of general formula (1), wherein R1 and R2 are H, OH, F, Cl, Br, I, 1 to 6 carbon alkyl or alkenyl, 1 to 6 carbon alkoxy, aryl, OR5, nitro, amino, CF3 or R1 and R2 are taken together to form a fused ring at the 1,2- or 2,3-positions providing a fused phenyl group or a benzodioxane group, or a 4- or 7-substituted indole group, or a 4- or 5- or 8-substituted quinoline group; R3 represents a group selected from hydrogen, a 1 to 6 carbon alkyl, a 1 to 4 carbon alkoxy or a halogen; R4 represents a group selected from hydrogen, 1 to 6 carbon alkyl or R5; R5 is CH2Ph in which the phenyl ring can be optionally substituted by a group selected from OMe, halogen, CF3; X is selected from a group represented by N, CR4, CHR4 and CHCH; A is selected from a group represented by N, NH, CH and CH2; B is selected from a group represented by =O, =S, H and H2; or A and B may be concatenated together to form indole, benzimidazole, indolone or indoline moieties; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, as well as pharmaceutical compositions and methods of treating central nervous system disorders utilizing these compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 209/08; A61K 31/40; C07D 209/34; C07D 403/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/08 (2006.01); C07D 209/34 (2006.01); C07D 209/42 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/34 (2013.01); C07D 209/08 (2013.01); C07D 209/42 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955672A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955672 A2 19991104; WO 9955672 A3 20000120; AR 015036 A1 20010411; AU 3667899 A 19991116; CA 2330452 A1 19991104; CN 1155567 C 20040630; CN 1307562 A 20010808; EP 1076647 A2 20010221; JP 2002513001 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032400

2005-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050518

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001004;LT PAYMENT 20001004;LV PAYMENT 20001004;RO PAYMENT 20001004;SI PAYMENT 20001004