Global Patent Index - EP 1076682 A1

EP 1076682 A1 2001-02-21 - USE OF ALDEHYDES AS ODOROUS MATERIALS

Title (en)

USE OF ALDEHYDES AS ODOROUS MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ALDEHYDEN ALS RIECHSTOFFE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ALDEHYDES COMME MATIERES ODORANTES

Publication

EP 1076682 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913298 A

Priority

  • DE 19814913 A
  • EP 9902018 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814913A1] The invention relates to the use of aldehydes as odorous materials, which can be produced through partial or total hydroformylation of cyclo-octadienes, from which cyclo-octanaldehyde is excluded. The inventive compounds exhibit interesting scents, among which potato scent is dominant. They are also characterised by a good persistence of said scent and a good diffusion capability. In addition, they exhibit a scent enhancer capability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C07C 45/50 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0038 (2013.01); C07C 45/50 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 45/50 + C07C 47/43

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951713A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814913 A1 19991007; EP 1076682 A1 20010221; IL 138790 A 20040219; IL 138790 D0 20011031; JP 2002510744 A 20020409; US 6555517 B1 20030429; WO 9951713 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040621

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAO CORPORATION

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL