Global Patent Index - EP 1076727 A1

EP 1076727 A1 2001-02-21 - MULTILAYER BOND COAT FOR A THERMAL BARRIER COATING SYSTEM AND PROCESS THEREFOR

Title (en)

MULTILAYER BOND COAT FOR A THERMAL BARRIER COATING SYSTEM AND PROCESS THEREFOR

Title (de)

MEHRSCHICHTIGE HAFTBESCHICHTUNG FÜR WÄRMEDÄMMSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN DAZU

Title (fr)

REVETEMENT DE LIAISON MULTICOUCHE POUR SYSTEME DE REVETEMENT A BARRIERE THERMIQUE ET PROCEDE Y RELATIF

Publication

EP 1076727 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908549 A

Priority

  • US 9904339 W
  • US 7639198 P
  • US 25964999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943861A1] A method of depositing a bond coat (16) of a thermal barrier coating (TBC) system (14) for components designed for use in a hostile thermal environment, such as turbine, combustor and augmentor components (10) of a gas turbine engine. The method yields a dense, bi-layer bond coat (16) having an adequate surface roughness for adhering a plasma-sprayed ceramic layer (18). The method generally entails depositing a first bond coat layer (16a) using a high velocity oxy-fuel (HVOF) technique employing a relatively fine metallic powder having a relatively narrow size distribution. Following heat treatment, a second bond coat layer (16b) is deposited on the first bond coat layer (16a) by air plasma spraying (APS) a relatively coarser metallic powder of particles having a relatively broader size distribution. The resulting second bond coat layer (16b) is characterized by a macro-surface roughness of about 450 to about 750 microinches Ra. Following a second heat treatment, the ceramic layer (18) is deposited that adheres to the bond coat (16) through mechanical interlocking with the rough surface of the second coat layer (16b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/02; C23C 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 28/321 (2013.01); C23C 28/3215 (2013.01); C23C 28/325 (2013.01); C23C 28/345 (2013.01); C23C 28/3455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943861 A1 19990902; CZ 20004537 A3 20020116; CZ 300909 B6 20090909; DE 69925590 D1 20050707; DE 69925590 T2 20060427; EP 1076727 A1 20010221; EP 1076727 B1 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100227

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100226

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

- Free text: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#1 RIVER ROAD#SCHENECTADY, NY 12345 (US) -TRANSFER TO- GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#1 RIVER ROAD#SCHENECTADY, NY 12345 (US)

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69925590 P 20050707

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE