Global Patent Index - EP 1076738 A2

EP 1076738 A2 2001-02-21 - METHOD FOR DEPLOYMENT OF A MOORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DEPLOYMENT OF A MOORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR DAS AUSLEGEN EINES BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLOIEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'AMARRAGE

Publication

EP 1076738 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99915019 A

Priority

  • US 9906469 W
  • US 7341198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964684A2] A method for deployment of mooring systems for mobile offshore drilling units and for connecting the same to the mooring lines (76) thereof. An anchor handling vessel (10) having a stern roller (12), one or more suction anchors (70), a deployment connection (73) and a mooring connection (88). The anchor handling vessel has an anchor deployment mechanism incorporating a handling line having a quick-disconnect socket connector (74) for accomplishing movement of the suction anchor over the stern roller to the sea bottom. After deployment of the suction anchor, the handling line is disconnected from the connection and the anchor handling wire (78) is moved from the deployment connection to the mooring connection for mooring the suction anchor to the offshore drilling unit. A plurality of mooring strings are deployed in this matter to properly station the drilling unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/22 (2006.01); B63B 21/00 (2006.01); B63B 21/27 (2006.01); B63B 21/50 (2006.01); E02D 5/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/27 (2013.01); B63B 21/22 (2013.01); B63B 21/50 (2013.01); B63B 2021/007 (2013.01); B63B 2021/505 (2013.01); E02D 5/80 (2013.01); E02D 2250/0053 (2013.01); E02D 2250/0061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964684 A2 19991216; WO 9964684 A3 20000323; WO 9964684 A8 20010308; AU 3363699 A 19991230; AU 743420 B2 20020124; BR 9910349 A 20020716; CA 2331176 A1 19991216; CA 2331176 C 20070918; EP 1076738 A2 20010221; EP 1076738 A4 20030827; ID 27033 A 20010222; NO 20005579 A 20010104; NO 20005579 D0 20001103; OA 11691 A 20050112

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-08-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150715

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 21/27 20060101ALI20150616BHEP

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 21/50 20060101ALI20150616BHEP

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 21/00 20060101ALI20150616BHEP

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02D 5/80 20060101ALI20150616BHEP

2015-07-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 21/22 20060101AFI20150616BHEP

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070827

2003-08-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02D 7/00 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02D 29/00 B

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE