Global patent index - EP 1076749 A1

EP 1076749 A1 2001-02-21 - DOG FOR FIXING A WINDOW GLASS ONTO A WINDOW LIFTER

Title (en)

DOG FOR FIXING A WINDOW GLASS ONTO A WINDOW LIFTER

Title (de)

MITNEHMER ZUR ANBINDUNG EINER FENSTERSCHEIBE AN EINEN FENSTERHEBER

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEUR POUR RELIER UNE VITRE DE FENETRE A UN LEVE-VITRE

Publication

EP 1076749 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929056 A

Priority

  • DE 9901270 W
  • DE 19819910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819910C1] The invention relates to a dog (2) for connecting a window glass (1) to a window lifter, consisting of retainer limbs (21, 22) allocated to both sides of the lower edge of the window glass. At least one retainer limb has a recess in which a window bolt can be engaged for catching the window glass (1). At least the top part of at least one retainer limb (21, 22) has an elastic configuration. According to the invention, a retaining area (27) is allocated to the retainer limb (22) embodied as a longitudinal hole guide while the other retainer limb (21) is allocated a horizontally flexible fixing area (26). According to another embodiment, a contour (63) is formed in the lower edge area of the window glass (1), the cross section of which is configured as a segment of a circle, whereby the height of said segment is determined by the angular section to be covered between the dog (2) and the window edge (11) and the contour (63) rests on a support surface (51) arranged on the dog (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957399A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819910 C1 19990617; BR 9910249 A 20010109; EP 1076749 A1 20010221; EP 1076749 B1 20030312; ES 2194473 T3 20031116; US 6557302 B1 20030506; WO 9957399 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090428

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090428

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070427

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2194473

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE