Global Patent Index - EP 1076750 A2

EP 1076750 A2 2001-02-21 - ADJUSTABLE CARRIER FOR CONNECTING A WINDOW PANE TO A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFT

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE CARRIER FOR CONNECTING A WINDOW PANE TO A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFT

Title (de)

EINSTELLBARER MITNEHMER ZUR ANBINDUNG EINER FENSTERSCHEIBE AN EINEN KRAFTFAHRZEUG-FENSTERHEBER

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEUR REGLABLE SERVANT A LA LIAISON D'UNE VITRE DE FENETRE A UN LEVE-VITRE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1076750 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99932638 A

Priority

  • DE 9901362 W
  • DE 19819953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819953A1] The invention relates to an adjustable carrier for connecting a window pane to a window lift of a motor vehicle door, whereby the carrier is assigned to the motor vehicle door via guiding tracks. The carrier is essentially comprised of a base body and of a holding body. The base body is guided on the guiding tracks of the window lift, and the window pane is clamped in the holding body. The holding body can horizontally sweep in relation to the base body, and a joint connection is provided between the base body and the holding body. According to the invention, adjusting means (511) which can be operated by a tool (510) are provided for changing the position of the holding body (2.5) relative to the base body (1.5). This position is directly or indirectly changed by the actuation of the adjusting means in such a way that the position of the holding body relative to the base body remains unchanged when loosening the fastening the window pane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01); E05F 11/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05F 11/525 (2013.01); E05F 2011/387 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/314 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957400A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819953 A1 19991118; EP 1076750 A2 20010221; EP 1076750 B1 20020313; ES 2174623 T3 20021101; US 6453617 B1 20020924; WO 9957400 A2 19991111; WO 9957400 A3 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900982

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130716

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-04-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030404

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174623 T3

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900982 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE