Global patent index - EP 1076753 A1

EP 1076753 A1 2001-02-21 - DOOR ARRANGEMENT WITH FIRE PROTECTION FUNCTION

Title (en)

DOOR ARRANGEMENT WITH FIRE PROTECTION FUNCTION

Title (de)

TÜRSYSTEM MIT FEUERSCHUTZFUNKTION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PORTE DOTE D'UNE FONCTION DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCENDIE

Publication

EP 1076753 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99950357 A

Priority

  • SE 9900763 W
  • SE 9801654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958804A1] In a method for the manufacturing of a door arrangement, particularly a door leaf, a door frame or a dressing of a door, with fire protecting properties, a first and a second door sheet, each door sheet having a first and a second surface (1), is used. A fire-protecting, substantially homogeneous silicate suspension (2), particularly comprising alkali metal silicate and filler, with hardener are applied to at least the first surface of the first door sheet. A filling material (3) is applied to said silicate suspension, whereafter the first and second door sheets are assembled to form a door leaf, so that the first surface of the respective door sheet is faced toward each other. Finally, the fire-protecting, substantially homogeneous silicate suspension is allowed to harden and give off part of its loosely bound water. The door leaf may also comprise absorber means (4). A door frame or a dressing of a door is manufactured in a corresponding way.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958804A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958804 A1 19991118; AT 284477 T 20041215; AU 4305799 A 19991129; DE 69922502 D1 20050113; DE 69922502 T2 20051215; EE 04727 B1 20061016; EE 200000655 A 20020415; EP 1076753 A1 20010221; EP 1076753 B1 20041208; NO 20005601 A 20001106; NO 20005601 D0 20001106; NO 314316 B1 20030303; PL 343885 A1 20010910; RU 2232241 C2 20040710; SE 513478 C2 20000918; SE 9801654 D0 19980508; SE 9801654 L 19991109

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69922502

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2006-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-02-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922502

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LU NL

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: LT LV

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-12-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DALOC FUTURA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031217

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LU NL

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20001016;LV PAYMENT 20001016