Global Patent Index - EP 1076762 A1

EP 1076762 A1 2001-02-21 - DEVICE FOR HYDRAULICALLY ADJUSTING THE ANGLE OF ROTATION OF A SHAFT IN RELATION TO A DRIVING WHEEL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HYDRAULICALLY ADJUSTING THE ANGLE OF ROTATION OF A SHAFT IN RELATION TO A DRIVING WHEEL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HYDRAULISCHEN DREHWINKELVERSTELLUNG EINER WELLE ZU EINEM ANTRIEBSRAD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT HYDRAULIQUE DE L'ANGLE DE ROTATION D'UN ARBRE PAR RAPPORT A UNE ROUE D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 1076762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923415 A

Priority

  • DE 19819995 A
  • EP 9902504 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819995A1] The invention relates to a device for adjusting the angle of rotation of the camshaft (1) of an internal combustion engine in relation to its driving wheel. The device essentially consists of an inner part (2) which is provided with webs (4a to 4d) or blades and which is arranged in a cell wheel (5) in such a way that it can rotate. This driven cell wheel (5) has several webs (6a to 6d) arranged around the periphery, each of which are divided into two pressure chambers (7a to 7d, 8a to 8d) by the webs (4a to 4d) or blades of the inner part (2). Subjecting the pressure chambers to pressure or relieving them of pressure causes the angle of rotation to change. As the shaft approaches its final position, the displacement is hydraulically dampened by integrated damping elements. Said damping elements are formed by the interaction of the webs (4a to 4d, 6a to 6d) of the inner part (2) and the cell wheel (5) as they approach each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34426 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957423A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819995 A1 19991111; CN 1113155 C 20030702; CN 1299437 A 20010613; EP 1076762 A1 20010221; EP 1076762 B1 20020626; ES 2175978 T3 20021116; JP 2002513883 A 20020514; JP 4422899 B2 20100224; US 6390043 B1 20020521; WO 9957423 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090415

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090414

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090414

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090414

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-12-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175978 T3

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901863 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE