Global Patent Index - EP 1076766 A1

EP 1076766 A1 2001-02-21 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE INJECTION NOZZLE FOR LIQUID INJECTION MEDIA

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A HIGH-PRESSURE INJECTION NOZZLE FOR LIQUID INJECTION MEDIA

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HOCHDRUCK-EINSPRITZDÜSE FÜR FLÜSSIGE EINSPRITZMEDIEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR INJECTEURS HAUTE PRESSION POUR SUBSTANCES D'INJECTION LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1076766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920815 A

Priority

  • DE 19820341 A
  • EP 9902908 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820341A1] According to the invention, a damping device is provided for a control device for high-pressure injection nozzles for liquid injection media. A damper (35) is associated with the armature base plate (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 63/0022 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 2200/30 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957429A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820341 A1 19991118; DE 19820341 C2 20000406; EP 1076766 A1 20010221; EP 1076766 B1 20021030; US 6305355 B1 20011023; WO 9957429 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150429

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT